California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:09-cv-00997
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Mar 06, 2009
Terminated:Oct 26, 2011
Defendant
American Metal & Iron Inc.
Defendant
AMI Southern California Inc.
Defendant
Antique & Salvage Liquidators, Inc.
Defendant
ASL
Defendant
ASL Recycling
Defendant
Asset Services and Liquidators
Defendant
Big H Enterprises Inc.
Defendant
Dimond Metals Inc.
Defendant
Howard Misel
Mediator
Suzanne Nusbaum
Plaintiff
Amado Martinez
Plaintiff
Carlos Avila
Plaintiff
Edwin Martinez
Plaintiff
Gabriel Franco
Plaintiff
Gustavo Mejia
Plaintiff
Oscar Rodriguez
Plaintiff
Roger Lindolfo
Plaintiff
Wilmer Ruiz

GPO Sep 14 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation, filed by Gabriel Franco, Edwin Martinez, Oscar Rodriguez, Gustavo Mejia, Roger Lindolfo, Carlos Avila, Wilmer Ruiz, Amado Martinez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/14/2009. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
GPO Feb 11 2010
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 Stipulation, filed by Gabriel Franco, Edwin Martinez, Oscar Rodriguez, Gustavo Mejia, Roger Lindolfo, Carlos Avila, Wilmer Ruiz, Amado Martinez. Plaintiffs shall file their First Amended Complaint as a separate docket entry within 3 days of this order. Fact Discovery Cutoff extended to July 31, 2010. Remaining scheduling dates are vacated; further Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/11/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2010)
GPO Mar 12 2010
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 Stipulation for Leave to File the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/12/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2010)
GPO May 11 2010
ORDER SETTING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/1/2010. Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/11/2010. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
GPO Jun 08 2010
ORDER DENYING 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/8/2010.(hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
GPO Jan 20 2011
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS AGAINST CERTAIN DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE re 63. Defendants Big H Enterprises Inc., Dimond Metals Inc., AMI Southern California Inc., and American Metal & Iron Inc. are TERMINED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/20/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
GPO Jan 20 2011
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 CONTINUING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT 46. The hearing on Defendants' motion shall take place on 2/1/2011 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/20/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
GPO Feb 08 2011
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 46 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/8/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
GPO Feb 08 2011
ORDER (1) TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION 52 Plaintiffs' motion to compel and (2) GRANTING 50 Plaintiffs' application for order to show cause. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/8/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
GPO Feb 08 2011
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO CHRIS OLIVERIO RE: HIS FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR DEPOSITION. On or before March 1, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., Oliverio shall either (1) appear for his deposition at a date, time, and place agreed to between himself and Plaintiffs counsel or (2) appear in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, United States District Court, 280 South First Street, San Jose, CA 95113 and show cause, if any, why he should not be held in contempt under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 45 for his failure to obey the subpoena.Plaintiffs shall personally serve Oliverio with a copy of this order by February 14, 2011. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/1/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 3/1/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/8/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
GPO Feb 25 2011
ORDER (1) MODIFYING 70 February 8, 2011 order granting in part and denying in part Defendants' motion for summary judgment and (2) DENYING AS MOOT 74 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration. Signed by Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/25/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
GPO Mar 07 2011
ORDER DENYING 52 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/7/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
GPO Mar 10 2011
ORDER re 84 stipulation to waive jury. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 3/8/2011. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
GPO Oct 26 2011
ORDER RE 92 STIPULATION for Approval of Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 10/26/11. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.