Rapid-American Corporation
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:13-bk-10687 |
Case Filed: | Mar 08, 2013 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 04, 2013 |
Claims Deadline: | Nov 15, 2013 |
Terminated: | Apr 07, 2022 |
Plan Confirmed: | Sep 13, 2021 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | Over 100,000 |
Est. Assets | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Rapid-American Corporation
530 5th Ave Fl 9
New York, NY 10036-5115 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Claims and Noticing Agent
Logan & Company, Inc Claims Agent
546 Valley Rd. Second Floor
Upper Montclair, NJ 07043 |
|
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Caplin & Drysdale, Chartered 600 Lexington Avenue 21st Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
33 Whitehall Street 21st Floor
New York, NY 10004 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Thursday, April 07, 2022 | ||
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 04/07 3:01 PM
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra) |