Georgia Northern District Court
Case #: 1:09-cv-00717
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2009
Terminated:Mar 03, 2010
Counter Claimant
United Parcel Service, Inc.
Counter Defendant
ViaViente Taiwan, LP
Defendant
United Parcel Service Co. (Taiwan Branch)
Defendant
United Parcel Service, Inc.
Defendant
UPS International Inc. (Taiwan Branch)
Interested Party
Craig Keeland
Mediator
Robert W Faulkner
Plaintiff
ViaViente Global GP
Plaintiff
ViaViente Global LP
Plaintiff
ViaViente International GP, Inc.
Plaintiff
ViaViente International, LP
Plaintiff
ViaViente Taiwan, LP

GPO Feb 17 2009
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER - GRANTING 4 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division, filed by United Parcel Service, Inc. This civil action is hereby TRANSFERRED to the US District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard A. Schell on 2/17/2009. (baf, ) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 3/17/2009.]


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.