Original Case: 2:07-cv-09539

Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:09-cr-30857
Typecivil rights / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:Sep 17, 2009
Terminated:Aug 19, 2010
Last checked: Thursday Mar 21, 2024 8:14 PM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Aircraft Service International, Incorporated, doing business as Aircraft Service International Group
Represented By
Cornelius R. Heusel
Jones Walker, L.L.P.
contact info
Samuel M. Matchett
King & Spalding, L.L.P.
contact info
Amy C. Cowley
Jones Walker, L.L.P.
contact info
Tony Ventry
Axiall Corporation
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
United Air Lines, Incorporated
Plaintiff - Appellant
Lionel H. Irons
Represented By
Anundra M. Martin Dillon
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Seth Martin
Represented By
Anundra M. Martin Dillon
contact info

GPO Aug 19 2010
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [09-30857 Affirmed] Judge: CDK , Judge: CES , Judge: CH. Mandate pull date is 09/09/2010; denying motion to strike document filed by Appellants Mr. Lionel H. Irons and Mr. Seth Martin [6574010-3]; granting motion to strike portion of brief filed by Appellee Aircraft Service International Inc [6571568-2]; denying motion to file supplemental briefs filed by Appellants Mr. Lionel H. Irons and Mr. Seth Martin [6594507-2] [09-30857]

Docket last updated: 03/21/2024 8:14 PM CDT
Thursday, September 17, 2009
20 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Lionel H Irons and Mr. Seth Martin 09-30857 (CPD)
Related: [-]