Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Referred: Joe Brown
Case #: 3:09-cv-00061
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 16, 2009
Terminated:Jun 06, 2011
Last checked: Thursday Dec 29, 2016 12:51 AM CST
Defendant
Samuel Riyad
Represented By
David Denty Cheatham
Cheatham, Palermo & Garrett
contact info
Defendant
Sam's Kabab Gyros (335 Nashville Pike, Gallatin, TN 37066)
Defendant
Sam's Kabab Gyros (7114 Highway 70 S, Nashville, TN 37221)
Plaintiff
Kebab Gyros, Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer S. Ghanem
Keller Turner Ruth Andrews & Ghanem, PLLC
contact info
Thomas D. Ruth
Keller Turner Ruth Andrews & Ghanem, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter Defendant
Kebab Gyros, Inc.
Terminated: 06/06/2011
Represented By
Jennifer S. Ghanem
Keller Turner Ruth Andrews & Ghanem, PLLC
contact info
Thomas D. Ruth
Keller Turner Ruth Andrews & Ghanem, PLLC
contact info
Counter Plaintiff
Samuel Riyad
Terminated: 06/06/2011
Represented By
David Denty Cheatham
Cheatham, Palermo & Garrett
contact info
Defendant
Nabil Gerges
Terminated: 09/08/2009
Represented By
Blakeley D. Matthews
Cornelius & Collins, LLP
contact info
Benjamin M. Rose
Law Offices Of Ben M. Rose, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kabab Gyros (437 Sam Ridley Parkway, Nashville, TN 37167)
Terminated: 09/08/2009

GPO Dec 17 2009
MEMORANDUM of the Court signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 12/17/09. (ab)
GPO Mar 29 2010
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 03/29/2010. (ab)
GPO Apr 19 2011
MEMORANDUM. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/19/11. (dt)
GPO Apr 20 2011
ORDER: For the reasons discussed in the accompanying Memorandum, defendant Samuel Riyad's Second Motion for Summary Judgment 143 is GRANTED, and the plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affidavits of Medhat Khalil and Milad Riyad 164 is DENIED. The plaintiff's claims in this case are DISMISSED. Samuel Riyad still has counterclaims pending under antitrust law and challenging the validity of the mark at issue in this case 33. If, despite his success here, Riyad still wishes to pursue these claims, he should file notice with the court so stating within 20 days of this Order. Otherwise, the court will close the file and dismiss this case in its entirety. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/19/11. (dt)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.