Tennessee Middle District Court
Case #: 3:09-cv-00411
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 08, 2009
Terminated:May 20, 2011
Cross Defendant
Michael Lee
Cross Defendant
Sumakaya Corporation
Cross Plaintiff
Lynns Corp. of America
Cross Plaintiff
Victor Tsai
Defendant
Lynns Corp. of America
Defendant
Michael Lee
Defendant
Sumakaraoke.com
Defendant
Sumakaya Corporation
Defendant
Sumakaya.com
Defendant
Victor Tsai
Plaintiff
Chappell & Co., Inc.
Plaintiff
Cotillion Music, Inc.
Plaintiff
Dayspring Music, LLC
Plaintiff
Rightsong Musc, Inc.
Plaintiff
Unichappell Music, Inc.
Plaintiff
Walden Music, Inc.
Plaintiff
Warner Music Group Corp.
Plaintiff
Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.
Plaintiff
Warner/Tamerlane Publishing Corp.
Plaintiff
WB Music Corp.
Plaintiff
Word Entertainment
Plaintiff
Word Holdings LLC
Plaintiff
Word Music Group, LLC
Plaintiff
Word Music, LLC.
Plaintiff
Wordspring Music, LLC
Third Party Defendant
Chartbuster Karaoke
Third Party Defendant
Music Maestro
Third Party Defendant
Nutech Entertainment
Third Party Defendant
Tennessee Production Center, Inc.
Third Party Defendant
Three Boys, LTD
Third Party Plaintiff
Lynns Corp. of America
Third Party Plaintiff
Victor Tsai

GPO Jun 15 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 06/15/2010. (ab)
GPO Jun 15 2010
ORDER denying 125 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 06/15/2010. (ab)
GPO Sep 13 2010
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 101 MOTION for Summary Judgment be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Any party has 14 days after service of this Report and Recommendation in which to file any written objections tothis Recommendation with the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 09/13/2010. (ab)
GPO Sep 13 2010
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that 102 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings be DENIED. Any party has 14 days after service of this Report and Recommendation in which to file any written objections to this Recommendation with the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge E. Clifton Knowles on 09/13/2010. (ab)
GPO Oct 01 2010
ORDER: The 187 Report and Recommendation is adopted and approved. Accordingly, Tennessee Production Center's 102 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. This case remains set for trial on 10/26/2010. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/01/2010. (ab)
GPO Oct 08 2010
ORDER: Plaintiffs' 101 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: The Motion is GRANTED as to all Defendants with respect to direct copyright infringement. The Motion is DENIED as to all Defendants with respect to willful copyright infringement because there are material facts in dispute. The Motion is DENIED as to all Defendants with respect to attorneys' fees and costs as premature. This case remains set for trial on October 26, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/08/2010. (ab)
GPO Oct 19 2010
ORDER granting 200 Motion in Limine. The trial will be bifurcated with liability and damages determined at separate phases of the trial. Parties shall file supplemental verdict forms and related jury instructions by Wednesday, October 20, 2010. Any replies shall be filed by Friday, October 22, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/19/2010. (ab)
GPO Oct 19 2010
ORDER : Pending before the Court is Defendant's 253 Request for Judicial Notice. Plaintiffs' response is due by Wednesday, October 20, 2010. Any replies shall be filed by Friday, October 22, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/19/2010. (ab)
GPO Oct 21 2010
ORDER granting 284 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/21/2010. (ab)
GPO Oct 22 2010
ORDER granting 309 Motion for Leave to File Response. Plaintiffs shall file their response by Friday, October 29, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 10/22/2010. (ab)
GPO Sep 07 2011
JUDGMENT AGAINST THE THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, TPC: Judgment shall be entered in favor of the Third-Party Plaintiffs and against TPC in the amount of $1,200,000.00, plus any and all attorneys' fees and costs incurred in obtaining and collecting said judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Todd J. Campbell on 9/7/11. (xc:Pro se party by regular and certified mail.)(dt)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.