Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Melinda Harmon
Case #: 4:09-cv-00286
Nature of Suit690 Forfeiture/Penalty - Other
Cause18:0981 Forfeiture in Rem
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2009
Terminated:Sep 10, 2009

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 6:06 PM CDT
Friday, January 30, 2009
1 1 6 pgs COMPLAINT against $118,109.28 (One Hundred Eighteen Thousand One Hundred Nine Dollars and 28/100 in US Currency filed by United States of America.(Kempner, Susan) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
Related: [-]