Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Scoles
Case #: 1:13-cv-00021
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2013
Terminated:Apr 24, 2014
Last checked: Friday Jan 09, 2015 6:40 AM CST
Defendant
David A Wild
5300 N Park Place NE Suite 121
Cedar Rapids, IA 52402
Represented By
Gregg Geerdes
contact info
Garnishee
Bankers Trust Co
Garnishee
Collins Community Credit Union
1150 42nd Street SE PO Box 10500
Cedar Rapids, IA 52402
Garnishee
Farmers State Bank
Plaintiff
Avnet, Inc
Represented By
Amy L Reasner
Lynch, Dallas, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Catalyst Resource Group, LLC
Terminated: 07/03/2013

GPO Apr 15 2014
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Avnet, Inc.; denying 24 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by David A. Wild. Not later than 4/21/14, Avnet must file and serve a sworn affidavit regarding the current amount owed under the promissory note. By not later than 4/28/14, Wild may file a response to Avnet's affidavit. If necessary, the Court will hold a hearing on the limited issue of the amount owed on the promissory note. After the amount owed is established, the Court will order entry of judgment in favor of Avnet and against Wild on the guaranty. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 4/14/14. (ksy)
GPO Apr 24 2014
ORDER For Entry of Judgment: The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Avnet, Inc. and against David A. Wild in the amount of Eight Hundred Twenty-Seven Thousand Seven Hundred Fifty-Three Dollars and Thirty-Four Cents ($827,753.34), plus post-judgment interest at the statutory rate from and after 4/17/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon S Scoles on 4/24/14. (ksy)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.