|
GPO
Apr 22 2009
ORDER EXTENDING PRETRIAL DEADLINES - Non Expert Discovery 6/24/2009, Expert Discovery 7/29/2009, Dispositive Motion due by 7/29/2009, Non-Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/2009, Jury Trial set for 11/17/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2009 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 4/22/2009. (Hernandez, M)
|
|
GPO
Jun 19 2009
ORDER CONTINUING PRETRIAL DEADLINES - Non Expert Discovery 7/24/2009, Expert Discovery 8/12/2009, Dispositive Motions due by 8/12/2009, Hearing 8/31/2009, Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2009, Hearing 8/19/2009, Pretrial Conference 10/7/2009 at 8:30 am before Judge Ishii, Jury Trial 11/17/2009 at 9:00 am before Judge Ishii signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 6/19/2009. (Hernandez, M)
|
|
GPO
Aug 10 2009
ORDER CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES and CONTINUING DATE OF TRIAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/7/2009. Dispositive Motions due by 10/22/2009. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2009. Jury Trial set for 2/2/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2009 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Settlement Conference set for 9/2/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck. (Jessen, A)
|
|
GPO
Sep 03 2009
ORDER DISMISSING Defendant First American Loanstar Trustee Services, LLC, in Light of Stipulation of Dismissal without Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/3/2009. (Figueroa, O)
|
|
GPO
Sep 10 2009
STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINES: Non Expert Discovery 11/6/2009, Expert Discovery 12/7/2009, Hearing on Non Dispositive Motions 11/20/2009, Hearing on Dispositive Motions 12/14/2009, Jury Trial set for 2/2/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 9/8/2009. (Hernandez, M)
|
|
GPO
Nov 02 2009
ORDER Extending Pre-Trial Deadlines, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 10/28/09. Non-Expert Discovery: 11/6/2009, Expert Discovery: 12/7/2009, Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii, Jury Trial set for 2/2/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Verduzco, M)
|
|
GPO
Jan 19 2010
ORDER Continuing Status/Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 1/15/2010. Status/Settlement Conference set for 2/11/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (DLB) before Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck.(Verduzco, M)
|
|
GPO
Jun 21 2010
ORDER CLOSING CASE in Light of Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice signed by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/18/2010. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
|