California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:08-cv-03186
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2008
Terminated:May 07, 2010
Creditor
AzoogleAds.com, Inc.
Defendant
Edward Heckerson
Defendant
Find A Quote
Defendant
Kirk Whiting
Defendant
Mark Theis
Defendant
Richard Rausch
Plaintiff
Asis Internet Services
Plaintiff
Foggy.net
Plaintiff
Joel Householter
Plaintiff
Kneeland Engineering

GPO Jan 15 2009
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 16 Status Report filed by Asis Internet Services, Joel Householter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 15, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2009)
GPO Mar 17 2009
ORDER FOLLOWING Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 3/17/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
GPO Jul 10 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 Stipulation filed by Asis Internet Services, Joel Householter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 9, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
GPO Sep 02 2009
ORDER FOLLOWING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 1, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
GPO Sep 04 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT against Kirk Whiting re 46. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/3/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
GPO Dec 11 2009
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 11, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
GPO Jan 21 2010
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 21, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/22/2010: # (1) Certificate of service) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
GPO Mar 19 2010
ORDER Granting Application to Appear Telephonically re 68 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on March 19, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
GPO May 03 2010
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte Granting re 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granting in Part & Denying in Part re 67 Motion to Dismiss. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/5/2010: # (1) Certificate of service) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
GPO May 07 2010
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 6, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.