California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:08-cv-03248
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2008
Terminated:Jan 24, 2012
Counter-claimant
Emcore Corporation
Counter-claimant
Venture Corporation Limited
Counter-defendant
Avago Technologies Canada Corporation
Counter-defendant
Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited
Counter-defendant
Avago Technologies Japan LTD
Counter-defendant
Avago Technologies U.S., Inc
Defendant
Emcore Corporation
Defendant
Venture Corporation Limited
Defendant
Venture Manufacturing(s) LTD
Evaluator
Samuel R. Miller
Plaintiff
Avago Technologies Canada Corporation
Plaintiff
Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited
Plaintiff
Avago Technologies Japan LTD
Plaintiff
Avago Technologies U.S., Inc

GPO Dec 22 2008
ORDER Denying 7 Motion to Dismiss; Granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Complaint due 1/22/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/22/2008 (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008) Modified docket text on 12/23/2008 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jan 16 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time for Emcore to File Response re 32 Stipulation. Deadline to file Response due 1/22/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/16/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2009)
GPO Jan 23 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 36 Stipulation, filed by Avago Technologies Japan LTD, Avago Technologies Canada Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Avago Technologies U.S., Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on January 23, 2009. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
GPO Feb 17 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER to Enlarge Time for Venture Corporation Limited to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint re 41 Stipulation. Response due 3/3/2009. Signed by Judge James Ware on 2/17/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
GPO Jul 24 2009
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Early Neutral Evaluatio re 58 Stipulation. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/23/2009. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2009)
GPO Aug 24 2009
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (MODIFIED BY THE COURT) re 63 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 8/22/2009. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2009) Modified docket text to create linkage on 8/26/2009 (ecg, COURT STAFF).
GPO Dec 17 2009
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying as moot 70 defendant Emcore Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Documents. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
GPO Dec 18 2009
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part 65 defendant Emcore Corporation's Motion to Compel Initial Disclosures. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
GPO May 24 2010
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting to File First Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint re 88 Stipulation. The parties have previously filed the attachment to the stipulation as a separate document. See 89 Answer to Complaint. Signed by Judge James Ware on 5/24/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
GPO Sep 09 2010
STIPULATION RE MODIFICATION OF CASE SCHEDULE re 107 Stipulation. The Court modifies the case schedule as follows: Close of All Discovery due by 8/8/2011. Last Date for Hearing Dispositive Motions due by 10/3/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due 6/17/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. *** Deadlines terminated re 87 Modified Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/9/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
GPO Mar 24 2011
STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting Request to Modify Case Schedule re 151 Stipulation. ***Deadlines terminated re 108 Stipulation. Set/Reset Scheduling Deadlines: Close of All Discovery due by 9/26/2011. Last Date for Hearing Motions due by 11/21/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference statement due 8/19/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/29/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose before Hon. James Ware.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 3/24/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
GPO Jun 27 2011
e Hon. James Ware. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/19/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/27/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2011)STIPULATION AND ORDER re 155 Stipulation filed by Venture Corporation Limited Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 9/9/2011. Discovery due by 10/17/2011. Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco befor
GPO Jul 14 2011
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY REFERRAL. Signed by Judge James Ware on 7/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
GPO Sep 14 2011
ORDER CONTINUING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Joint Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 11/4/2011. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/14/2011 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 9/14/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
GPO Nov 08 2011
ORDER continuing preliminary pretrial conference. Signed by Judge James Ware on November 8, 2011. (jwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
GPO Dec 05 2011
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 162 Stipulation filed by Avago Technologies Japan LTD, Avago Technologies Canada Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Avago Technologies U.S., Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/5/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
GPO Jan 18 2012
ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Status Report due by 3/2/2012. Status Conference set for 3/12/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/18/12. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
GPO Jan 18 2012
AMENDED ORDER VACATING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/18/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
GPO Jan 24 2012
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 167 Stipulation filed by Avago Technologies Japan LTD, Avago Technologies Canada Corporation, Avago Technologies International Sales PTE Limited, Avago Technologies U.S., Inc. Signed by Judge James Ware on 1/24/12. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.