California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:08-cv-01233
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause15:1640 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2008
Terminated:Oct 30, 2008
Defendant
America's Wholesale Lender
Defendant
Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Defendant
Recontrust Company
Plaintiff
Jesus G. Tina
Plaintiff
Rosario Tina

GPO Aug 05 2008
ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 8/5/08. The court denies the application for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction 3. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)
GPO Oct 30 2008
ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 10/30/08. The court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss in part and denies the motion in part 13. The court grants Plaintiffs 45 days leave from the date of entry of this order to file a First Amended Complaint(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl) Modified on 1/20/2009 to include link to document #13 (tkl).
GPO Jan 05 2009
ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 1/5/09. Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is rejected for filing.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service). Modified on 1/20/2009 to edit text (tkl).
GPO Feb 02 2009
ORDER signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 2/2/09. The Court grants defendants' motion for involuntary dismissal 23. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment for Defendants.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(tkl)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.