Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 1:08-cv-21737
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2008
Terminated:Mar 05, 2009
Defendant
Domingo Santos
Defendant
Roberto Santos
Defendant
Rosa M. Santos
Defendant
Santos Furniture Custom Design, Inc.
Mediator
John W. Salmon
Plaintiff
Cristobal Navarro

GPO Apr 01 2009
ORDER denying 76 Motion to Terminate Consideration of Defendant's Bill of Costs; granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond re 75 MOTION for Bill of Costs ( Responses due by 4/11/2009). Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 4/1/2009. (jw)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.