California Northern District Court
Case #: 4:07-cv-01719
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2007
Terminated:Jun 07, 2007
Defendant
City of Emeryville
Plaintiff
Woodfin Suite Hotels, LLC

GPO May 02 2007
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 17 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007)
GPO Jun 07 2007
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 13 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
GPO Jan 14 2008
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 37 Motion to Shorten Time (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2008)
GPO Mar 14 2008
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion to Set Aside Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2008)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.