City of Oakland v. Hotels.Com, L.P. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Saundra Brown Armstrong |
Case #: | 4:07-cv-03432 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 29, 2007 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2009 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 07, 2019 7:56 PM PST |
Defendant
Orbitz, LLC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trip Network, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TravelwebLLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Travelocity.Com, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Site 59.Com, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Priceline.Com Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LowestFare.Com Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Internetwork Publishing Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Expedia, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Evaluator
Richard James Collier
Titchell Maltzman Mark & Ohleyer 650 California St., 25th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94108 |
|
Plaintiff
City of Oakland
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Travelport, Inc.
Terminated: 09/27/2007
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Travelocity.Com, Inc.
Terminated: 09/27/2007
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Travelnow.Com, Inc.
Terminated: 09/27/2007
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sabre Holdings Corporation
Terminated: 09/27/2007
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Orbitz, Inc.
Terminated: 09/27/2007
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maupintour Holding, LLC
Terminated: 09/10/2007
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hotels.Com, L.P.
Terminated: 09/27/2007
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hotels.Com GP, LLC
Terminated: 09/27/2007
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, September 14, 2009 | ||
55 | 55
![]() |