California Northern District Court
Judge:Marilyn H Patel
Referred: Bernard Zimmerman
Case #: 3:07-cv-05569
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2007
Terminated:Mar 30, 2010
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 24, 2022 5:28 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Knoll, Inc.
Represented By
Bryan J. Sinclair
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Hopkins & Carley
contact info
Karineh Khachatourian
Kxt Law, LLP
contact info
Phil Green
Green & Green
contact info
William H. Brewster
Kilpatrick Stockton LLP
contact info
R. Charles Henn, Jr.
Kilpatrick Stockton LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Alphaville Design, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffrey G. Knowles
Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass
contact info
Phil Green
Green & Green
contact info
Julia D. Greer
Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass
contact info
P. Craig Cardon
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Slattery
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Neil Arthur Smith
Kb Ash Law Group P.C.
contact info
Counter-defendant
DOES A-Z
Counter-defendant
David Lee
Represented By
Phil Green
Green & Green
contact info
Julia D. Greer
Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass
contact info
P. Craig Cardon
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Slattery
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Neil Arthur Smith
Kb Ash Law Group P.C.
contact info
Counter-defendant
Peggy Lee
Represented By
Phil Green
Green & Green
contact info
Julia D. Greer
Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass
contact info
P. Craig Cardon
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Slattery
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Neil Arthur Smith
Kb Ash Law Group P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Knoll, Inc.
Represented By
Bryan J. Sinclair
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky And Popeo, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Michael Ratinoff
Hopkins & Carley
contact info
Karineh Khachatourian
Kxt Law, LLP
contact info
George Gottlieb
Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman P.C.
contact info
Marc P. Misthal
Gottlieb Rackman & Reisman, P.C.
contact info
William H. Brewster
Kilpatrick Stockton LLP
contact info
R. Charles Henn, Jr.
Kilpatrick Stockton LLP
contact info
Robert Paul Taylor
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Herman Miller, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen P. Ellingson
Hayes Scott Bonino Ellingson Guslani Simonson & Clause LLP
contact info
Mediator
Vicki Veenker
Shearman & Sterling LLP Five Palo Alto Square, 6th Floor 3000 El Camino Real
Palo Alto, CA 94306
Plaintiff
Alphaville Design, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Eldan
Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass, LLP
contact info
Jeffrey G. Knowles
Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass
contact info
Phil Green
Green & Green
contact info
Julia D. Greer
Coblentz, Patch, Duffy & Bass
contact info
P. Craig Cardon
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Nicole Marie Slattery
Sheppard, Mullin, Richter & Hampton LLP
contact info
Neil Arthur Smith
Kb Ash Law Group P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Counter-defendant
Danrick Commerce Group, LLC
Terminated: 03/18/2008
Represented By
Neil Arthur Smith
Kb Ash Law Group P.C.
contact info
Counter-defendant
Danny Louie
Terminated: 03/18/2008
Represented By
Neil Arthur Smith
Kb Ash Law Group P.C.
contact info

GPO Dec 07 2007
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 1/15/2008 for defendant to file responsive pleading; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 12/6/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
GPO Jan 07 2008
STIPULATION AND ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference reset for 3/17/2008 04:00 PM, with a joint CMC statement due not later than 3/10/2008; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 1/7/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2008)
GPO Feb 07 2008
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to and including 2/22/2008 for defendant to file responsive pleading; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 2/6/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2008)
GPO Feb 28 2008
ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting 23 Motion to Relate Case C 08-0778 MHP to this action. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2008)
GPO Mar 20 2008
ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 7/1/2008 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/20/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
GPO Apr 22 2008
STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING C 08-0778 MHP until 14 days after resolution of C 07-5569 MHP; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/21/2008.(awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2008)
GPO May 06 2008
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL 42; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 4/30/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2008)
GPO Sep 11 2008
ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Protective Order; (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)
GPO Oct 07 2008
ORDER finding that C 08-3437 WHA is NOT RELATED TO THIS ACTION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 10/6/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
GPO Nov 19 2008
ORDER Granting re 134 Stipulation For Limited Protective Order Concerning Confidential Settlement Documents filed by Alphaville Design, Inc.. Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/18/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
GPO Jun 05 2009
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: Alphaville's motion for partial summary judgment is DENIED. Knoll's motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2009)
GPO Jul 28 2009
ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEYS: Attorney Neil Arthur Smith; P. Craig Cardon and Nicole Marie Lee are withdrawn as attorneys of record for Alphaville, David Lee and Peggy Lee; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/24/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
GPO Aug 04 2009
RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
GPO Aug 04 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER: Status Conference continued to 8/31/2009 03:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 8/3/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
GPO Sep 03 2009
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/3/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
GPO Sep 11 2009
STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating order 256 referring this matter to the Hon. Bernard Zimmerman for settlement conference; Parties shall proceed with private ADR before the Hon. Edward A Infante; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 9/11/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
GPO Feb 05 2010
STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING DISCOVERY MASTER re 321 Stipulation filed by Alphaville Design, Inc.. Signed by Judge Marilyn H. Patel on 2/5/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2010)
GPO Mar 19 2010
STIPULATION AND ORDER amending briefing schedules re motions for summary judgment; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/18/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 02, 2010
351 351 NOTICE by Knoll, Inc. of Withdrawal of Mintz Levin (Taylor, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2010
350 350 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 3/30/2010. (awb, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 29, 2010
349 349 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphaville Design, Inc. re348 Stipulation (Greer, Julia)
Related: [-]
348 348 STIPULATION Stipulated Permanent Injunction by Alphaville Design, Inc., Knoll, Inc., David Lee, Peggy Lee. (Greer, Julia)
Related: [-]