Alabama Middle District Court
Case #: 3:06-cv-00385
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2006
Terminated:Jun 15, 2006
Defendant
Casey Torbert
Defendant
Corey Welch
Defendant
Jay Jones
Interested Party
Staff Attorneys
Plaintiff
Joey Lynn Smith

GPO May 02 2006
ORDER granting 2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until fee is paid in full;. Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Lee County Detention Center, as directed. Signed by Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson on 5/2/06. Furnished to cashier (djy, )(djy, )
GPO May 02 2006
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that this cause be dismissed as frivolous within the meaning of 28 USC 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii); Objections to R&R due by 5/15/2006. Signed by Judge Vanzetta P. McPherson on 5/2/06. (djy, )
GPO Jun 15 2006
ORDER ADOPTING 4 Report and Recommendations; and This action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/15/06. (Attachments: # (1) appeals checklist)(vma, )
GPO Jun 15 2006
FINAL JUDGMENT it is the Order, Judgment, and Decree of the Court that this action is dismissed with prejudice; The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter this document on the civil docket as a final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the FRCP . Signed by Judge William Keith Watkins on 6/15/06. (Attachments: # (1) appeals checklist)(vma, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.