Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:13-bk-40875
Case Filed:Apr 02, 2013
Creditor Meeting:May 03, 2013
Terminated:May 28, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Nov 21, 2013

TypeOther Entity Type
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Midvale Lodging, LLC
8000 Warren Pkwy Ste 206
Frisco, TX 75034-2292
Represented By
Joyce W. Lindauer
contact info
Arthur I. Ungerman
Arthur I. Ungerman, Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Unsecured Creditors Committee
Franklin Skierski Hayward LLP 10501 N. Central Expressway, Ste. 106
Dallas, TX 75231
Represented By
Melissa S. Hayward
Franklin Chapman Skierski Hayward LLP
contact info
Michael Parmerlee
Franklin Chapman Skierski Hayward LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702
Represented By
Timothy W. O'Neal
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info
John M. Vardeman
Ust Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 28, 2015
415 415 Order Granting Related [+]. (lc)
Related: [-] 413 Application for Final Decree and Close Case Filed by Midvale Lodging, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor Midvale Lodging, LLC
Bankruptcy Case Closed (lc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
414 414 misc Operating Report Wed 05/27 5:48 PM
Operating Report for Filing Period 1st Quarter 2015 Filed by Midvale Lodging, LLC (Lindauer, Joyce)
Related: [-]