StrikeForce Technologies Inc. v. PhoneFactor Inc.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Richard G Andrews |
Case #: | 1:13-cv-00490 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 28, 2013 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2016 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 08, 2015 5:31 AM EST |
Counter Claimant
PhoneFactor Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
StrikeForce Technologies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PhoneFactor Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
StrikeForce Technologies Inc.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
First Midwest Bancorp Inc.
Terminated: 12/04/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fiserv Inc.
Terminated: 06/11/2013
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 20, 2016 | ||
233 | 233
1
pgs
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Wed 01/20 4:06 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,870,599 B2.(nms) |
|
Att: 1 1 pgs Order | ||
232 | 232
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Wed 01/20 2:00 PM
ORDER Granting231 Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by StrikeForce Technologies Inc. (***Civil Case Terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/20/2016. (nms) |
|
231 | 231
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/20 10:50 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by StrikeForce Technologies Inc..(Caponi, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
230 | 230
order
Order
Tue 01/19 1:52 PM
ORDER Granting (229 in 13-cv-490-RGA-MPT, 12 in 15-cv-465-RGA) Stipulation To Stay. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/15/2016. Associated Cases: 1:13-cv-00490-RGA-MPT, 1:15-cv-00465-RGA(nms) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
229 | 229
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation-General (See Motion List for Stipulation to Extend Time)
Thu 01/14 4:51 PM
STIPULATION to Stay by PhoneFactor Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Farnan, Brian) |