California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:06-cv-00083
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1121 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 09, 2006
Terminated:May 23, 2006
Defendant
Francis L. Dean & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff
Gagliardi Insurance Services

GPO Apr 12 2006
ORDER RE SETTLEMENT; STAND-BY ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 7/19/2006 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/12/06. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.