California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:06-cv-00275
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Jan 13, 2006
Terminated:Nov 08, 2007
Defendant
Ann Vanderbilt
Defendant
Barbara Ballone
Defendant
David B. Feldstein
Defendant
ECS
Defendant
Edward L. Suggs
Defendant
Elizabeth Miller
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, Inc.
Defendant
First Collect Inc
Defendant
Healthcare Business Resources Inc
Defendant
Mitchell D. Bluhm
Defendant
National Asset Management Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant
National Asset Management Inc
Defendant
Pam McCuller
Defendant
Professional Emergency Services
Defendant
Sarah Chiles
Defendant
Thomas B. Barker
Defendant
Thomas Chapman
Defendant
West Asset Management,Inc.,
Plaintiff
Aaron King

GPO Oct 02 2006
ORDER granting 65 Association of Counsel, filed by Elizabeth Miller,, First Collect Inc,, David B. Feldstein,, Healthcare Business Resources Inc,, Pam McCuller,, Ann Vanderbilt,, Edward L. Suggs,. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/2/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2006)
GPO Oct 13 2006
ORDER granting 67 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Elizabeth Miller,, Attorney William Angelo Munoz terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/13/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
GPO Oct 13 2006
ORDER granting 68 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by First Collect Inc,, Attorney William Angelo Munoz terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/13/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
GPO Oct 13 2006
ORDER granting 69 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by David B. Feldstein,, Attorney William Angelo Munoz terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/13/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
GPO Oct 13 2006
ORDER granting 70 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Ann Vanderbilt,, Attorney William Angelo Munoz terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/13/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
GPO Oct 13 2006
ORDER granting 71 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Pam McCuller,, Attorney William Angelo Munoz terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/13/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2006)
GPO Oct 18 2006
ORDER granting 77 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Healthcare Business Resources Inc,, Attorney William Angelo Munoz terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/18/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2006)
GPO Oct 18 2006
ORDER granting 78 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Healthcare Business Resources Inc,, Attorney William Angelo Munoz terminated.. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/18/2006. (mat, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2006)
GPO Apr 02 2007
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Brian J. Olson. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 3/30/2007. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2007)
GPO Aug 14 2007
ORDER re 124 Stipulation filed by West Asset Management,Inc., Settlement Conference set for 9/25/2007 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 8/14/07. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2007)
GPO Sep 05 2007
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEShow Cause Response due by 9/19/2007.Signed by Judge Jenkins on 9/5/2007. (mjjlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2007 (epb, COURT STAFF).
GPO Sep 28 2007
n 10/1/2007 (ls, COURT STAFF).ORDER by Judge Martin J. Jenkins finding as moot 138 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and Setting Hearing Date for 125 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (mjjlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) Additional attachment(s) added o
GPO Oct 30 2007
ORDER REGARDING HEARING ON SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 10/30/2007. (mjjlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 10/31/2007 (rbe, COURT STAFF).
GPO Nov 01 2007
ORDER re 153 Proposed Order, filed by Pam McCuller, David B. Feldstein, Elizabeth Miller, First Collect Inc, Edward L. Suggs, Healthcare Business Resources Inc, Ann Vanderbilt. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/1/07. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2007)
GPO Nov 08 2007
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal of certain parties with dismissal. Sarah Chiles; ECS; National Asset Management Enterprises, Inc.; National Asset Management Inc; West Asset Management,Inc.,; Thomas B. Barker and Mitchell D. Bluhm terminated. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 11/06/07. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
GPO Nov 08 2007
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Martin J. Jenkins on 11/08/07. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2007)
GPO Apr 25 2008
ORDER Further Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2008 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 4/25/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
GPO Apr 30 2008
AMENDED ORDER re 164 Order, Set Hearings Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2008 10:00 AM. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
GPO Jul 06 2009
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/6/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2009)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.