Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Debra Mcvicker Lynch
Referred: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Case #: 1:13-cv-00540
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2013
Terminated:Mar 24, 2014
Last checked: Thursday Jan 08, 2015 3:01 AM EST
Defendant
B&B VENTURES, INC.
Represented By
Alan D. Wilson
contact info
Defendant
BRIAN BURNETTE
1014 N. Webster
Kokomo, IN 46901
Plaintiff
AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY
6101 Anacapri Drive
Lansing, MI 48917
Represented By
Christopher D. Simpkins
Taylor Law Firm
contact info
David L. Taylor
Taylor Law Firm, PC
contact info

GPO Apr 02 2013
ORDER - The Court ORDERS Auto-Owners to file an Amended Complaint by April 8, 2012 that properly pleads a basis for this Court's jurisdiction. Defendants need not answer or otherwise respond to Auto-Owners' Complaint, [dkt. 1], but, instead, should answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint as set forth in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure after they are either served or waive service. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 4/2/2013. (JKS)
GPO Jun 07 2013
ORDER to file joint jurisdictional statement-The Court orders the parties to meet and confer, and conduct whatever investigation necessary, to determine whether this Court has diversity jurisdiction. If the parties agree that the diversity jurisdiction is proper, they shall file a joint jurisdictional statement by 6/19/2013. If the parties cannot agree on the respective citizenships or the amount in controversy, they shall file separate jurisdictional statements by 6/19/2013. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/7/2013.(CBU)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.