Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Michael P Mccuskey
Referred: David G Bernthal
Case #: 2:07-cv-02051
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2007
Terminated:Oct 01, 2007

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, October 01, 2007
30 30 2 pgs NOTICE of Agreement to Dismiss(Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
TEXT ORDER DISMISSING CASE entered by Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal on 10/1/07. This Court has reviewed and now approves the Notice of Agreement to Dismiss30 . The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this case. All existing deadlines and hearings are vacated and any pending motions are mooted. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 25, 2007
29 29 2 pgs NOTICE to Take Deposition of Henry W. Bell, III on 10/1/2007 by Defendant Glesco Electric Inc.(Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 29, 2007
28 28 NOTICE of Service of Subpoena (Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 16, 2007
27 27 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Defendant's Request to Admit by Elisabeth Pollock on behalf of Glesco Electric Inc (Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2007
26 26 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Defendant's Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Request for Production by Elisabeth Pollock on behalf of Glesco Electric Inc (Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 20, 2007
25 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Henry W Bell, III re serving Request for Production of Documents to defendant. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 19, 2007
24 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re Disclosures by Henry W Bell, III (SP, ilcd)
Related: [-]
23 23 ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant Glesco Electric Inc.(Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 31, 2007
22 22 ORDER entered by Judge Michael P. McCuskey on 5/31/07. The Report and Recommendation20 is accepted by the Court. Defendant's Motion to Strike and Dismiss7 is DENIED. Defendant is allowed 21 days to file its Answer to plaintiff's pro se complaint. (MT, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines: Glesco Electric Inc answer due 6/21/2007. (MT, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 14, 2007
21 21 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel Interrogatories and Request for Production by Elisabeth Pollock on behalf of Glesco Electric Inc (Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 11, 2007
20 20 4 pgs REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 5/11/07 re7 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Glesco Electric Inc. RECOMMENDED that7 Motion to Dismiss Complaint be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2007. See written order. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2007
19 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glesco Electric Inc of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures, Amended (Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
18 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Glesco Electric Inc for Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2007
17 17 5 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Response to Motion filed as Motion to Deny re7 defendant's First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Plaintiff Henry W Bell, III. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
16 16 RESPONSE to Motion filed as Motion to Deny7 defendant's First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Plaintiff Henry W Bell, III. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 24, 2007
15 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Elisabeth Pollock on behalf of Glesco Electric Inc (Pollock, Elisabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 23, 2007
14 14 DISCOVERY ORDER entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 4/23/07. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2008 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. Jury Selection/Jury Trial set for 10/20/2008 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A before Chief Judge Michael P. McCuskey. See written order. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2007
Minute Entry for proceedings held 4/19/07 before Judge David G. Bernthal. Appearance of plaintiff, Henry Bell, pro se. Appearance of Attorney J Steven Beckett for defendant. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Consent to Magistrate Judge discussed. Proposed plan reviewed and approved. Written order to be entered. ADR options offered. Court is granting11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to7 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Response to Motion to Dismiss7 is due by 4/27/2007. (Tape #UR-C 1:30 PM.) (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2007
13 13 CERTIFICATE of Service/Counsel re12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by J Steven Beckett on behalf of Glesco Electric Inc (Beckett, J)
Related: [-]
12 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Glesco Electric Inc. (Beckett, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 28, 2007
11 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to7 Defendant's First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiff Henry W Bell, III. Responses due by 4/16/2007 (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 16, 2007
10 10 ORDER entered by Judge David G. Bernthal on 3/16/07 setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2007 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom C before Magistrate Judge David G. Bernthal. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 15, 2007
9 9 RULE 56 NOTICE re7 Defendant's First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint mailed to pro se plaintiff Henry W. Bell, III by the Clerk. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support re7 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Glesco Electric Inc. (Beckett, J)
Related: [-]
7 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Glesco Electric Inc.Responses due by 4/2/2007 (Beckett, J)
Related: [-]
6 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Glesco Electric Inc. (Beckett, J)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by J Steven Beckett on behalf of Glesco Electric Inc (Beckett, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 05, 2007
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry W Bell, III. Glesco Electric Inc served on 3/5/2007, answer due 3/26/2007. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
3 3 Remark: Plaintiff given Administrative Order Regarding Service in Pro Se Cases by Clerk. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
2 2 Summons Issued as to Glesco Electric Inc. and given to plaintiff for service. (VB, ilcd)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT against Glesco Electric Inc (Filing fee $ 350.00)(U5593), filed by Henry W Bell, III. (VB, ilcd) Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1 (VB, ilcd). Modified on 3/5/2007 to attach exhibit (VB, ilcd).
Related: [-]