California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:06-cv-01141
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1104 Recovery of Benefits to Employee
Case Filed:May 26, 2006
Terminated:Jul 05, 2007
Cross Claimant
L. Donald Guess
Cross Claimant
Raymond Michael aka Ray Shea and Raymond M. Shea
Cross Claimant
Xelan the Economic Association of Health Professionals
Cross Defendant
L. Donald Guess
Cross Defendant
Raymond Michael aka Ray Shea and Raymond M. Shea
Cross Defendant
XELAN
Defendant
DOES
Defendant
Indianapolis Life Insurance Company
Defendant
L. Donald Guess
Defendant
RAYMOND M SHEA
Defendant
Raymond Michael aka Ray Shea and Raymond M. Shea
Defendant
XELAN
Plaintiff
Quality Improvement Consultants, Inc.
Plaintiff
Susan Olson
Plaintiff
Timothy G Olson

GPO May 16 2007
ORDER; mandatory settlement conf held on 5/16/07 at 9:30am; a joint motion for dismissal must be filed no later than 6/18/07; Settlement Disposition Conference set for 6/21/2007 09:00 AM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major; all other pending dates before Magistrate Judge Major are vacated; any matters currently scheduled before the district judge shall remain in effect pending notice from that court; the joint motion and stipulation rescheduling expert designation and disclosure dates, discovery completion date and pretrial motion submission date 45 is denied as moot; Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/16/07. (kaj)
GPO Jul 05 2007
ORDER for Dismissal - On joint motion of the parties 52 and good cause appearing, it is hereby ordered that the above captioned matter is dismissed with prejudice in its entirety. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/2/07. (aje)(bar ).


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.