20
|
|
20
JUDGMENT dismissing Plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 5/18/09 (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
ORDER granting15 Motion to Dismiss; adopting Report and Recommendations re18 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims should be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable David C. Bramlette, III on 5/18/09 (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Travis Potter, Marvin Blow, Steven Bither, Kris Knight, Donald Reed Objections to R&R due by 5/1/2009 Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on April 17, 2009 (Harris, M.)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Remark: Report and Recommendations18 forwarded to pro se plaintiff via regular mail on 4/17/09. (KPM)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
ORDER directing response to motion Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on February 17, 2009 (Harris, M.)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Remark: order17 forwarded to pro se plaintiff via regular mail on 2/17/09. (KPM)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
9
pgs
MEMORANDUM in Support re15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kris Knight, Marvin Blow, Steven Bither, Donald Reed, Travis Potter (Givens, Angela)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
MOTION to Dismiss by Kris Knight, Marvin Blow, Steven Bither, Donald Reed, Travis Potter (Givens, Angela)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
NOTICE of Change of Address by Andrew Stamps (new address: 173 Sewanee Drive, Jackson, Missisippi 39209) (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
SUMMONS Returned Executed Kris Knight served on 10/2/2008, answer due 12/1/2008; Marvin Blow served on 10/2/2008, answer due 12/1/2008; Steven Bither served on 10/2/2008, answer due 12/1/2008; Donald Reed served on 10/2/2008, answer due 12/1/2008; Travis Potter served on 10/2/2008, answer due 12/1/2008. (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt by Attorney General of the United States filed. (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF Receipt on September 30, 2008, as to Civil Process Clerk, filed. (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Kris Knight served on 9/30/2008, answer due 11/29/2008; Marvin Blow served on 9/30/2008, answer due 11/29/2008; Steven Bither served on 9/30/2008, answer due 11/29/2008; Donald Reed served on 9/30/2008, answer due 11/29/2008; Travis Potter served on 9/30/2008, answer due 11/29/2008. (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
Summons Issued as to Kris Knight, Marvin Blow, Steven Bither, Donald Reed, Travis Potter. (ND)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ORDER: That the clerk correct the plaintiffs inmate number from #05751-042 to #05751-043. That the plaintiff states on page 3 of his complaint1 that the defendants are Kris Knight, Supervisor at Unicor Department; Marvin Blow, Associate Warden at Unicor Department; Steven Bither, Factory Manager at Unicor Department, Donald Reed, Supervisor at Unicor Department andTravis Potter, Supervisor at Unicor Department. Therefore, the clerk is directed to change/edit the docket to reflect the defendants are the following: Kris Knight, Supervisor at Unicor Department; Marvin Blow, Associate Warden at Unicor Department; Steven Bither, Factory Manager at UnicorDepartment, Donald Reed, Supervisor at Unicor Department and Travis Potter, Supervisor at Unicor Department. Clerk directed to issue process as to Kris Knight, Marvin Blow, Steven Bither, Donald Reed, Travis Potter, with USMS to serve same; plaintiff, within 20 days, and defendant, at time of answer, shall provide court with every civil action number or appeal number which the plaintiff has had dismissed on the grounds that it is frivolous, malicious or fails to state a claim; and that subpoenas shall not be issued except by order of the Court. That the United States District Clerk shall serve, by certified mail, a copy of the summons, and a copy of the complaint and attachments1 along with a copy of this order upon the following: CIVIL PROCESS CLERK, Office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Mississippi,ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES 10th Street & Constitution Avenue Washington, D.C. 20530; KRIS KNIGHT, Supervisor at Unicor Department FCC-Medium - Yazoo City P.O. Box 5050 2255 Haley Barbour Parkway Yazoo City, Mississippi 39194, MARVIN BLOW, Associate Warden at Unicor Department FCC-Medium - Yazoo City P.O. Box 5050 2255 Haley Barbour Parkway Yazoo City, Mississippi 39194, STEVEN BITHER, Factory Manager at Unicor Department FCC-Medium - Yazoo City P.O. Box 5050 2255 Haley Barbour Parkway Yazoo City, Mississippi 39194, DONALD REED, Supervisor at Unicor Department FCC-Medium - Yazoo City P.O. Box 5050 2255 Haley Barbour Parkway Yazoo City, Mississippi 39194, TRAVIS POTTER, Supervisor at Unicor Department FCC-Medium - Yazoo City P.O. Box 5050 2255 Haley Barbour Parkway Yazoo City, Mississippi 39194. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 9/29/2008 (ND)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 9/29/2008 (ND)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
NOTICE of Change of Address to Bannum Place of Jackson, 1031 Wholesale Row, Jackson, MS 39201 by Andrew Stamps (MGB)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
ORDER That the plaintiff is granted until and including, September 3, 2008, to file a written response as previously directed by the order3 entered July 18, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 8/12/2008 (ND)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Response to Order re3 ORDER That on or before August 11, 2008, plaintiff is directed to file a written response, filed by Andrew Stamps. (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
ORDER That on or before August 11, 2008, plaintiff is directed to file a written response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael T. Parker on 7/18/2008 (ND)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Andrew Stamps (PKM)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
10
pgs
COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Andrew Stamps.(PKM)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibits
|