New Jersey District Court
Judge:Mary L Cooper
Referred: Lois H Goodman
Case #: 3:08-cv-02158
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 02, 2008
Terminated:Jan 29, 2010
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 28, 2016 12:43 AM EST
Counter Claimant
ALPHA BLUE ARCHIVES, INC.
Represented By
LAWRENCE D. MANDEL
Gertner Mandel, LLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
DAVID NAYLOR
PO BOX 16072
OAKLAND, CA 94610
Represented By
LAWRENCE D. MANDEL
Gertner Mandel, LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Back-Room Sales, Inc.
125 Route 526
Allentown, NJ 08501
Represented By
CRAIG S. HILLIARD
Stark & Stark, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
GOURMET VIDEO, INC.
Represented By
CRAIG S. HILLIARD
Stark & Stark, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
DAVID KURZMAN
125 Route 526
Allentown, NJ 08501
Represented By
CRAIG S. HILLIARD
Stark & Stark, PC
contact info
Defendant
ALPHA BLUE ARCHIVES, INC.
Represented By
LAWRENCE D. MANDEL
Gertner Mandel, LLC
contact info
Defendant
DAVID NAYLOR
PO BOX 16072
OAKLAND, CA 94610
Represented By
LAWRENCE D. MANDEL
Gertner Mandel, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GOURMET VIDEO, INC.
Represented By
CRAIG S. HILLIARD
Stark & Stark, PC
contact info
MICHAEL TERENCE PIDGEON
Pidgeon & Pidgeon, P.C.
contact info

GPO Oct 29 2008
MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 10/29/2008. (ss, )
GPO Oct 31 2008
MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by Judge Mary L. Cooper on 10/29/2008. (ss, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.