New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:08-cv-03329
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1109 Breach of Fiduciary Duties
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2008
Terminated:Feb 16, 2010
Defendant
THE LOOMIS COMPANY
Notice Only
arbnwk
Plaintiff
HARTFIELD, TITUS & DONNELLY, LLC

GPO Mar 10 2009
ORDER extending the close of Discovery to 5/29/2009.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 3/10/09. (cs, )
GPO Feb 17 2010
LETTER OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 2/16/10. (gh, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.