Louisiana Middle District Court
Judge:James J Brady
Referred: Christine Noland
Case #: 3:07-cv-00145
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2007
Terminated:Jan 23, 2009
Case in other court:19th JDC, 551,551

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, March 05, 2009
35 35 ORDER: Considering the34 motion to dismiss...All the claims of the pltfs, David E. Grimes, Sr. and Smuggy's Corporation, Inc. against the deft, City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge, be dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 3/4/2009. (JDL, )
Related: [-]
34 34 MOTION to Dismiss by David E. Grimes, Sr, Smuggy's Corporation, Inc.. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 23, 2009
33 33 Minute Entry/Notice and Order for proceedings held before Judge James J. Brady: Settlement Conference held on 1/23/2009. Discussions were held and the parties reached an agreement. 60 day dismissal order entered. (JDL, )
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER Pursuant to a settlement reached at the mediation held on 1/23/2009...This action is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reopen the action if the settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/23/2009. (JDL, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 16, 2009
31 31 ORDER: A mediation session will be held on Friday, 1/23/2009 at 9:00 AM in chambers before Judge James J. Brady. Each attorney acting as lead trial counsel, and each party, etc., shall attend and participate. On or before Wednesday, 1/21/2009, each party shall submit to the undersigned judge an in-camera letter/memorandum briefly outlining issues as stated in the order. The current deadline for filing joint jury instructions, etc., is extended until Tuesday, 1/27/2009. Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 1/16/2009. (JDL, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 14, 2009
30 30 AFFIDAVIT of Final Settlement Efforts by David E. Grimes, Sr, Smuggy's Corporation, Inc.. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 14, 2008
29 29 Proposed Pretrial Order FOR DEFENDANTS by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Hilburn, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 12, 2008
28 28 ORDER...In accordance with the preceding pretrial order, all parties shall comply with the instructions stated herein.... Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 11/10/08. (BP, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2008
27 27 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Judge James J. Brady: Pretrial Conference held on 11/10/2008...The parties shall comply with the deadlines stated herein.... Jury Trial set for 2/9/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge James J. Brady. (BP, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 30, 2008
26 26 Proposed Pretrial Order by David E. Grimes, Sr. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 16, 2008
25 25 UNIFORM PRETRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2008 at 01:45 PM in chambers before Judge James J. Brady. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/27/2008. (BP, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 26, 2008
24 24 NOTICE..this matter is being sent to the DJ for pretrial and trial dates.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 08/26/08. (PAH, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 22, 2008
23 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge, filed by David E. Grimes, Sr, Smuggy's Corporation, Inc..(BP, )
Related: [-]
22 22 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland: Telephone Conference held on 7/22/2008 regarding21 MOTION for Reconsideration of20 Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Petition filed by David E. Grimes, Sr. The motion is granted. (BP, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 03, 2008
21 21 MOTION for Reconsideration of20 Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Petition by David E. Grimes, Sr.(Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support
MOTION(S) REFERRED:21 MOTION for Reconsideration of20 Order on Motion for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Petition . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (PAH, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 26, 2008
20 20 ORDER denying as untimely19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Petition filed by David E. Grimes, Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 06/26/08. (PAH, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 19, 2008
19 19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Petition by David E. Grimes, Sr.(Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading; Supplemental and Amending Petition
MOTION(S) REFERRED:19 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental and Amending Petition. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (PAH, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 28, 2008
18 18 NOTICE to Take Deposition of David E. Grimes, Sr. (Hilburn, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2008
17 17 ORDER granting16 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines except the deadline for amending pleadings and adding new parties, are extended for 60 days.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine Noland on 04/10/08. (PAH, )
Related: [-]
16 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Discovery Deadlines by David E. Grimes, Sr. (Craft Alford, Jill)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2007
15 15 Minute Entry/Order for proceedings held before Judge Christine Noland : Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2007. The parties informed the Court that they should be able to complete discovery within the existing deadlines. Therefore the record will be reviewed after the 06/15/08, motion deadline to determine if the case is ready for pretrial and trial dates. (PAH, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2007
14 14 RULING denying5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge.... Signed by Judge James J. Brady on 7/10/2007. (SAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 05, 2007
13 13 ORDER..The scheduling conference set for 07/20/07 is CANCELLED.. Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2007. Discovery and discovery motions due by 4/15/2008. Expert Witness List due by 4/1/2008 for pltf and by 05/01/08 for dfts. Expert Reports due by 4/15/2008 for pltfs and by 05/15/08 for dfts. Experts shall be deposed by 6/1/2008. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 6/15/2008. Telephone Status Conference set for 9/10/2007 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 07/05/07. (PAH, ) Modified on 7/6/2007 to edit text(PAH, ).
Related: [-]
12 12 STATUS REPORT by David E. Grimes, Sr. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2007
11 11 Statement of Material Facts to5 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Plaintiff's Opposition To filed by David E. Grimes, Sr. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition to5 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Motion In Opposition filed by David E. Grimes, Sr. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
9 9 4 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition to5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David E. Grimes, Sr. (Craft, Jill)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 04, 2007
8 8 NOTICE of Hearing before JJB on5 MOTION for Summary Judgment :...Opposition to the motion shall be filed within 20 days of the date of this notice... the mover may file a reply brief within 15 days of the filing of the opposition... The motion will be submitted upon the expiration of the above-stated deadlines WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT. (PAH, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 01, 2007
7 7 3 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Hilburn, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 Statement of Material Facts to5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge. (Hilburn, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Summary Judgment by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge.(Hilburn, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit AFFIDAVIT OF SIMON KWAN
4 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge.(Hilburn, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 13, 2007
3 3 90 DAY CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2007 at 10:00 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Christine Noland. Status Report due by 7/6/2007.. Signed by Judge Christine Noland on 3/17/2007. (NLT, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 01, 2007
2 2 Letter dated 03/01/07 from Clerk to All Counsel of Record Re: Reassignment of case to MJ Noland. (PAH, )
Related: [-]
Case reassigned to Judge Christine Noland. Judge Docia L Dalby no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (PAH, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2007
1 1 13 pgs NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, Case Number 551,551. ( Filing fee $ 350 ), filed by City of Baton Rouge/Parish of East Baton Rouge.(PAH, )
Related: [-]