New Jersey District Court
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:07-cv-01251
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:145 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2007
Terminated:Feb 16, 2010
Counter Claimant
NAVINTA LLC
Counter Defendant
ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE, INC.
Defendant
NAVINTA LLC
Notice Only
ASHLEE B. MEHL
Notice Only
BENJAMIN J. LEHBERGER
Notice Only
DAVID G. CHANG
Notice Only
JAMES P. JEFFRY
Notice Only
KAREN L. HAGBERG
Notice Only
LAWRENCE J. MCCLURE
Notice Only
MAGARET A. PIERRI
Notice Only
MITCHELL M. WONG
Notice Only
RICHARD DEBODO
Notice Only
RICHARD J. BASILE
Notice Only
SIEGMUND GUTMAN
Notice Only
STEPHEN P. MCNAMARA
Notice Only
STEVEN H. SKLAR
Notice Only
WILLIAM J. KUHNE
Plaintiff
ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE, INC.

GPO Mar 26 2008
LETTER ORDER requesting certain extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/24/08. (lk)
GPO Jul 31 2008
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 7/31/2008. (tp )
GPO Mar 30 2009
OPINION filed re 137 MOTION for Joinder Pursuant to Federal Rule 25 filed by ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE, INC., 107 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction Due to Plaintiff's Lack of Standing filed by NAVINTA LLC. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 3/23/2009. (mmh)
GPO Aug 03 2009
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 8/3/2009. (mmh)
GPO Dec 18 2009
OPINION filed re 314 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by ABRAXIS BIOSCIENCE, INC. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 12/17/2009. (mmh)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.