Guam District Court
Case #: 1:06-cv-00025
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2006
Terminated:Jun 27, 2007
Defendant
Fujitsu Limited
Defendant
Fujitsu Microelectronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff
Nanya Technology Corp.
Plaintiff
Nanya Technology Corp. U.S.A.

GPO Jan 26 2007
Order overruling 44 Objections to Order Issued by Magistrate Judge . Signed by Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 1/25/07. (vtk, )
GPO Jun 27 2007
Order granting 192 Motion to Immediately Transfer for Convenience. The case is hereby transferred to the Northern District of California. The Clerk of Court shall close the case and notify the Clerk of Court in that district. Signed by Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 6/27/2007. (rmm, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.