|
GPO
Jul 01 2009
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (Attachments: # (1) Standing Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
|
|
GPO
Aug 20 2009
ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. THERE WILL BE NO MORE EXTENSIONS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/20/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
|
|
GPO
Nov 09 2009
NOTICE REGARDING ORAL ARGUMENT ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 9, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
|
|
GPO
Nov 12 2009
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [granting 18 Motion to Dismiss]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
|
|
GPO
Jan 25 2010
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Alsup denying 41 Motion to Dismiss (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
|
|
GPO
Jan 25 2010
***FILED IN WRONG CASE - PLEASE DISREGARD*** ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 25, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (sis, COURT STAFF).
|
|
GPO
Feb 08 2010
ORDER TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS IN.PDF FORMAT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
|
|
GPO
Mar 10 2010
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF MICHAEL G. SALEMI by Judge Alsup granting 51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
|
|
GPO
Mar 31 2010
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 59 Letter filed by Mary Jane Yakas]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/31/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
|
|
GPO
Apr 02 2010
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DEFER BRIEFING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Judge Alsup denying 54 Motion to Continue (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
|
|
GPO
Apr 07 2010
ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO STAY AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge Alsup granting 65 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
|
|
GPO
Apr 09 2010
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 69 Letter filed by Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/9/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
|
|
GPO
Apr 12 2010
ORDER DENYING RELIEF REQUESTED IN LETTER DATED A0RIL 9, 2010, AND VACATING HEARINGS [re 69 Letter filed by Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/12/2010. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
|
|
GPO
Apr 13 2010
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR A STAY AND RESCHEDULING HEARING FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 13, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
|
|
GPO
Apr 14 2010
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 14, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
|
|
GPO
May 20 2010
ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 20, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
|
|
GPO
May 24 2010
NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
|
|
GPO
Jun 16 2010
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to the Northern District of Illinois. Signed by Acting Chairman of the MDL Panel, Robert L. Miller, Jr. on 06/07/2010. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
|