Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:07-cv-00403
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2007
Terminated:Feb 28, 2011
Consol Counter Claimant
Google, Inc.
Consol Counter Claimant
Microsoft Corporation
Consol Counter Defendant
Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC
Consol Defendant
Google, Inc.
Consol Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
Consol Plaintiff
Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC
Counter Claimant
Yahoo! Inc.
Counter Defendant
Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC
Defendant
Yahoo! Inc.
Mediator
Robert W Faulkner
Plaintiff
Paid Search Engine Tools, LLC

GPO May 10 2010
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - After considering the submissions and the arguments of counsel, the court issues the following order concerning the claim construction issues herein (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 5/10/2010. (ch, )
GPO Sep 28 2010
ORDER overruling 179 Defendants' Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation Regarding Google Inc.'s and Microsoft Corp.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, adopting 172 Report and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Anticipation of Claims 12, 13, 15, 18 and 22 of U.S. Patent 7,043,450 under 35 U.S.C. § 102(e) filed by Google, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 9/28/10. (mrm, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.