Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Ewing Werlein, Jr
Case #: 4:07-cv-00074
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause9:9 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award
Case Filed:Jan 08, 2007
Terminated:May 16, 2007

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 08/20/2024 11:57 AM CDT
Monday, January 08, 2007
Filing fee re:1 Complaint : $350.00, receipt number 577879, filed. (agould, )
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT against The Hugh MacRae Land Trust (Filing fee $ 350) filed by Torch Energy Advisors Incorpoated.(jbradford, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2007 (smurdock, ).
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/18/2007 at 03:00 PM in Room 11521 before Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr.( Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr ) Parties notified.(jbradford, )
Related: [-]