California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:05-cv-01889
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Case Filed:May 09, 2005
Terminated:Sep 26, 2005
Defendant
Atletico Morelia S.A., DE C.V.
Plaintiff
Marquez Brothers International Inc.

GPO Jul 08 2005
ORDER re 10 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule filed by Atletico Morelia S.A., DE C.V. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/8/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2005)
GPO Aug 05 2005
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (rslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2005)
GPO Sep 26 2005
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/26/05. (rssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2005)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.