California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:05-cv-02162
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 26, 2005
Terminated:Jul 26, 2005
Defendant
Openwave Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff
Fredrick Louis

GPO Jul 26 2005
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice; Each side to bear costs; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 7/25/2005. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2005)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.