|
GPO
Nov 22 2006
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 11/22/06. (joeh, )
|
|
GPO
Dec 07 2006
ORDER following Settlement conf held 12/06/06. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/07/06. (joeh, )
|
|
GPO
Mar 20 2007
ORDER vacating settlement conf set for 03/21/07 . Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 03/20/07. (joeh, )
|
|
GPO
Mar 27 2007
Report and Recommendation that the Defendant's Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement 30 be granted. Written objections to be filed and served by 4/2/07; Reply to objections to be filed and served by 4/16/07. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 3/26/07. (aje) Modified on 3/28/2007 to update text (aje). (mam).
|
|
GPO
Jun 26 2007
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Hon. Anthony J. Battaglia granting dft repossession specialists, inc. dba ABA recovery service, Inc's application for good faith settlement determination of settlement with Pla Shaton Murphy. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 06/25/07. (joeh)
|
|
GPO
Jun 24 2008
ORDER Dismissing Action Without Prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 6/24/08. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(aje)
|