Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:David H Coar
Case #: 1:05-cv-01486
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2005
Terminated:Apr 08, 2005

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 03/25/2025 2:21 PM CDT
Monday, March 14, 2005
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from the Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (02 M2 0360) filed by defendants Dominick's Finer Foods, Inc., Scott Grimmett, Denise Hess with copy of summons and complaint. (hp, ) Modified on 8/28/2006 (rbf, ).
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (hp, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Dominick's Finer Foods, Inc., Scott Grimmett, Denise Hess, by Paige Odam Barnett, Aaron Robert Gelb, Richard H. Schnadig, Ethan G. Zelizer (hp, )
Related: [-]