Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:J Phil Gilbert
Referred: Donald G Wilkerson
Case #: 4:05-cv-04127
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2005
Terminated:Aug 27, 2009
Defendant
Rightchoice Insurance Company
Defendant
Rightchoice Managed Care, Inc.
Defendant
Unicare Health Insurance Company of the Midwest
Defendant
Unicare Illinois Services, Inc.
Defendant
Unicare National Services, Inc.
Defendant
WellPoint Health Networks, Inc.
Interested Party
Jonathan Lee Riches
Plaintiff
Diana Peek
Plaintiff
Greg Cima
Plaintiff
Jennifer Huff Wheeler
Plaintiff
Jessica Huff
Plaintiff
John Beckwith Jr.
Plaintiff
Linda McMahon
Plaintiff
Mike Beard
Plaintiff
Sharon Beard
Plaintiff
Stephen Jellen

GPO Feb 03 2006
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION/ORDER granting 30 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by Wellpoint Health Newworks, Inc., Unicare National Services, Inc., Unicare Illinois Services, Inc., Unicare Health Insurance Company of the Midwest, Rightchoice Managed Care, Inc., Rightchoice Insurance Company; denying 28 MOTION to Strike 13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Greg Cima; denying 21 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Greg Cima, Diana Peek, Linda McMahon, Mike Beard, Sharon Beard, John Beckwith, Jr., Stephen Jellen. Court reserves ruling on 13 and 26 Motions to dismiss pending filing of plaintiffs' responses to these motions.. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 2/3/06. (dka, )
GPO Apr 20 2006
ORDER GRANTING IN PART 36 Motion to Continue, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 48 Motion to Enforce, DENYING WITH PREJUDICE 48 Motion to Vacate, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 61 Motion for Discovery Conference, DENYING WITH PREJUDICE 62 Motion to Preserve All Documents, and GRANTING 66 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 4/20/06. (sgp)
GPO Jul 11 2006
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 13 Motion to Dismiss, granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss,. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/11/06. (msd, )
GPO Jan 05 2007
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 92 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 1/5/2007. (brk)
GPO Mar 16 2007
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Donald G. Wilkerson on 3/16/07. (rmb)
GPO Apr 06 2007
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION affirming in part and setting aside in part Judge Wilkerson's Order on defendants' motion to strike 106. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to unseal those Exhibits that remain sealed and to make Exhibit 48 part of the public record in this case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/6/07. (dka, )
GPO Mar 18 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, denying 182 MOTION to Conduct Discovery Pursuant to rule 56(f) filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/18/08. (dka, )
GPO Mar 18 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, denying 152 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs Motion and Memorandum in Support of Interim Class Certification of an Illinois RightCHOICE Policyholders Class filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/18/08. (dka, )
GPO Mar 18 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, granting in part and denying in part 134 MOTION to Compel filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek; granting in part and denying in part 141 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Plaintiffs Discovery Deadline For Oral Depositions to Encompass The Pending Motion to Compel filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/18/08. (dka, )
GPO Jun 09 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, granting 204 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek; granting 206 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition to Summary Judgment filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek. Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition 207 is considered timely filed. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/9/08. (dka, )
GPO Jun 18 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, denying 197 MOTION for Reconsideration re 194 Memorandum & Opinion, Terminate Motions,, filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/18/08. (dka, )
GPO Sep 25 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, granting 189 MOTION to Substitute Party Diana Peek, by her daughters, Petitioners, Jennifer Huff Wheeler and Jessica Huff filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek. Jennifer Huff Wheeler rep by Kenneth T. Goldstein, Jeffrey Mark Friedman, Morris L. Harvey, Clinton A. Krislov, and Jessica Huff rep by Kenneth T. Goldstein, Jeffrey Mark Friedman, Morris L. Harvey, Clinton A. Krislov added. Diana Peek terminated. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/25/08. (dka, )
GPO Sep 29 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, Denying 211 MOTION to Certify Question for Interlocutory Appeal filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr., Diana Peek.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 9/29/08. (bkl)
GPO Oct 22 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, granting 179 defendants' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Rightchoice Insurance Company, Unicare Illinois Services, Inc., Unicare National Services, Inc., WellPoint Health Networks, Inc., Rightchoice Managed Care, Inc., Unicare Health Insurance Company of the Midwest. Clerk of Court to enter judgment accordingly at close of case.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/22/08. (dka, )
GPO Oct 30 2008
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION, denying 225 MOTION for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 10/30/08. (dka, )
GPO Aug 27 2009
CLERK'S JUDGMENT (JF/bkl) Action has been settled. Case is dismissed with prejudice, without costs. Approved by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 8/27/09. (bkl)
GPO Jun 23 2010
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 257 Motion to Enjoin filed by Rightchoice Insurance Company, Unicare Illinois Services, Inc., Unicare National Services, Inc., WellPoint Health Networks, Inc., Rightchoice Managed Care, Inc., Unicare Health Insurance Company of the Midwest; denying as moot 262 MOTION for Hearing re 257 MOTION Motion to Enjoin pursuit of a class filed by Sharon Beard, Mike Beard, Jessica Huff, Stephen Jellen, Linda McMahon, Greg Cima, John Beckwith, Jr. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/23/2010. (dka, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.