Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:06-cv-00662
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2006
Terminated:Apr 26, 2007
Defendant
Texas Roadhouse Port Arthur
Plaintiff
Mary Elisabeth Oregel

GPO Dec 19 2006
ORDER adopting 3 Report and Recommendations and denying 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ordered that pltf pay the $350 filing fee by 2/2/2007. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 12/19/06. (tkd, )
GPO Apr 26 2007
ORDER adopting 7 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Ron Clark on 4/25/07. (tkd, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.