Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:04-cv-01477
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 07, 2004
Terminated:Jun 01, 2009
Consol Plaintiff
Alexander Cruz
Consol Plaintiff
Dale Salmon
Consol Plaintiff
David Krasnowski
Consol Plaintiff
Edward Grenier
Consol Plaintiff
Fernando Ramirez
Consol Plaintiff
Gerald Zarella
Consol Plaintiff
Ivan Hernandez
Consol Plaintiff
James W. Burns
Consol Plaintiff
John F. Moffo
Consol Plaintiff
Joseph Fischetti
Consol Plaintiff
Mark Gostyla
Consol Plaintiff
Mark Johnston
Consol Plaintiff
Nathaniel Shulde
Consol Plaintiff
Richard T. Paltauf
Consol Plaintiff
Robert Stokes
Consol Plaintiff
Russell Paltauf
Cross Claimant
City of Waterbury
Cross Defendant
Waterbury Fire Fighters Assoc
Defendant
City of Waterbury
Defendant
Waterbury Financial Planning and Assistance Bd
Defendant
Waterbury Fire Fighters Assoc
Notice
USCA
Plaintiff
Timothy D. Walker

GPO Feb 21 2006
Memorandum of Opinion ORDER granting 64 Motion to Dismiss . Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 2/21/2006. (Falcone, K.)
GPO Apr 03 2006
Ruling and ORDER denying as moot74 Motion for Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 4/3/06. (Malone, P.)
GPO Apr 02 2008
RULING AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 4/2/2008. (Ghilardi, K.)
GPO Mar 06 2009
Memorandum of Decision and ORDER granting 163 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 165 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Mark R. Kravitz on 3/6/2009. (Falcone, K.)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.