New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:05-cv-01078
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Fed Question: Fed Communications Act of 1
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2005
Terminated:Apr 27, 2006
Defendant
AT&T CORP.,
Notice Only
arbtre
Plaintiff
VIKING COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

GPO Oct 14 2005
OPINION re 3 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint . Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 10/14/05. (ck)
GPO Apr 27 2006
OPINION Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 4/27/2006. (ss, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.