Arkansas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:09-cv-00740
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 15, 2009
Terminated:Oct 01, 2009
Defendant
Alan C Lilly
Defendant
Andre Williams
Defendant
Arkansas Department of Children and Family Services
Defendant
Arkansas Department of Human Services
Defendant
Danny K Holmquist
Defendant
Department of Veterans Affairs
Defendant
E Morris
Defendant
Gardner
Defendant
Harrison Williams
Defendant
Herbert Lynn Hemphill
Defendant
J Leon Holmes
Defendant
Jennifer Waymack
Defendant
Jim Aukstolis
Defendant
Julie Besancon
Defendant
Leotis Nichols
Defendant
Magli
Defendant
Marsha W Clevinger
Defendant
Sandra Wilson
Defendant
Social Security Administration
Defendant
Steven Thomas
Defendant
Vera Dean Webb
Plaintiff
Paul M Lilly Sr

GPO Sep 17 2009
ORDER granting 1 plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and directing the plaintiff to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/17/09. (bkp) (Text modified on 9/17/2009 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd)
GPO Oct 01 2009
ORDER DISMISSING CASE for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/09. (bkp)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.