Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:03-cv-01302
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2003
Terminated:Mar 26, 2007
Defendant
American Assets Limited Trust Company
Defendant
Annette Holt
Defendant
Cambridge Global Group
Defendant
Christopher Buchanan
Defendant
Crown Enterprises
Defendant
Eugene J Kernan
Defendant
Funding Consultants Limited
Defendant
Global Management Group
Defendant
Hap M Butler
Defendant
International Funding Association
Defendant
International Funding Consultants
Defendant
Mari-Ann Alston
Defendant
Michael Bloomquist
Defendant
Richard Flowers
Defendant
Ronald Stephen Holt
Plaintiff
Brian Lunski
Plaintiff
Charles Kingston
Plaintiff
Deborah Wolf
Plaintiff
Investors in IFA
Plaintiff
James Vaughn
Plaintiff
Janice Gough
Plaintiff
John Yoder
Plaintiff
Kimberly Phillips

GPO Jan 30 2006
ORDER denying 157 Motion. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1-30-06.
GPO Feb 27 2007
ORDER that the parties are required to show good cause, in writing, as to why this case should not be dismissed on or before 3/9/07. If the parties fail to adhere to this order, the case will be dismissed with no further notice for lack of prosecution.Show Cause Response due by 3/9/2007.. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/26/07. (TLJ)
GPO Mar 26 2007
ORDERED that this case is hereby dismissed pursuant to LRCiv 41.1. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 3/26/07. (TLJ)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.