Arkansas Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:02-cv-00379
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 15, 2002
Terminated:Jun 16, 2005
Defendant
H E K Inc
Defendant
Tobacco Superstores Inc
Garnishee
First National Bank of Eastern Arkansas
Garnishee
Regions Bank
Plaintiff
Pamela Allen

GPO Aug 12 2005
ORDER. Signed by Judge George Howard Jr. on 8/12/05. (bkp, )
GPO Oct 06 2005
ORDER granting 183 185 Motions for Attorney Fees, for Hunt in the amount of $67,750.00 & Harris in the amount of $7,155.00; plaintiff is entitled to recover costs in the amount of $4,122.28; denying 193 Motion for Order to defer adjudication . Signed by Judge George Howard Jr. on 10/6/05. (dac )
GPO Mar 13 2007
ORDER denying 205 Bill of Costs filed by Pamela Allen. Signed by Judge George Howard Jr. on 3/13/07. (bkp)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.