Massachusetts District Court
Judge:George A Otoole, Jr
Case #: 1:09-cv-11550
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2009
Terminated:Mar 13, 2014
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2015 7:17 PM EDT
Consolidated Defendant
Ascion, LLC
Represented By
Allen S. Rugg
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Eric G.J. Kaviar
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Consolidated Defendant
Martin Rawls-Meehan
9 Winthrop Road
Lexington, MA 02421
Represented By
Allen S. Rugg
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Consolidated Plaintiff
Lung-Tan Shih
Represented By
Shen-Yuan Cheng
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Scott McConchie
Sherin And Lodgen LLP
contact info
Richard F. Cauley
Wayne Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley PLC
contact info
Jeffrey Wang
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Ellen J. Wang
Whgc, P.L.C.
contact info
Gina M. McCreadie
Nixon & Peabody, LLP
contact info
Franklin E. Gibbs
Wang Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley P.C.
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John David Van Loben Sels
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Peter Huang
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer L. Ishimoto
Wang Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Ruoey Lung Enterprise Corp
Represented By
Shen-Yuan Cheng
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Scott McConchie
Sherin And Lodgen LLP
contact info
Richard F. Cauley
Wayne Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley PLC
contact info
Jeffrey Wang
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Gina M. McCreadie
Nixon & Peabody, LLP
contact info
Franklin E. Gibbs
Wang Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley P.C.
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John David Van Loben Sels
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Peter Huang
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Erick P. Wolf
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Jennifer L. Ishimoto
Wang Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley P.C.
contact info
Counter Claimant
Lung-Tan Shih
Represented By
Shen-Yuan Cheng
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Scott McConchie
Sherin And Lodgen LLP
contact info
Richard F. Cauley
Wayne Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley PLC
contact info
Jeffrey Wang
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Gina M. McCreadie
Nixon & Peabody, LLP
contact info
Franklin E. Gibbs
Wang Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley P.C.
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John David Van Loben Sels
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Peter Huang
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Jennifer L. Ishimoto
Wang Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Ascion, LLC
Represented By
Eric J. Rutt
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Allen S. Rugg
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Eric G.J. Kaviar
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Robert B. Gibbons
Mirick, O'Connell, Demallie & Lougee
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Martin Rawls-Meehan
Represented By
Eric J. Rutt
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Allen S. Rugg
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruoey Lung Enterprise Corp
Represented By
Shen-Yuan Cheng
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Scott McConchie
Sherin And Lodgen LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Wang
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Gina M. McCreadie
Nixon & Peabody, LLP
contact info
John David Van Loben Sels
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer L. Ishimoto
Wang Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley P.C.
contact info
Thomas P. Gorman
Sherin And Lodgen LLP
contact info
Richard F. Cauley
Wayne Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley PLC
contact info
Ellen J. Wang
Whgc, P.L.C.
contact info
Franklin E. Gibbs
Wang Hartmann Gibbs & Cauley P.C.
contact info
Thomas F. Maffei
Sherin And Lodgen LLP
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Peter Huang
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Erick P. Wolf
Wang, Hartmann, Gibbs & Cauley, P.C.
contact info
Unknown
WHGC, P.L.C.
2570 W. El Camino Real Suite 440
Mountain View, CA 94040
Represented By
Anthony M. Doniger
Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen
contact info
Andrew R Levin
Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen, PC
contact info
Unknown
Esq. John D. van Loben Sels
WHGC, P.L.C. 2570 W. El Camino Real Suite 440
Mountain View, CA 94040
Represented By
Anthony M. Doniger
Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen
contact info
Andrew R Levin
Sugarman, Rogers, Barshak & Cohen, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Apex Health Care Manufacturing Inc
Terminated: 03/27/2013
Represented By
Mei Tsang
Fish & Associates
contact info
Andrea C. Kramer
Hirsch Roberts Weinstein LLP
contact info
Robert D. Fish
Fish And Associates
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Andrew N Mar
Fish And Associates
contact info
Joshua L Emory
Fish And Associates
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Defendant
Optima Healthcare Inc
Terminated: 03/27/2013
Represented By
Mei Tsang
Fish & Associates
contact info
Andrea C. Kramer
Hirsch Roberts Weinstein LLP
contact info
Robert D. Fish
Fish And Associates
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Andrew N Mar
Fish And Associates
contact info
Joshua L Emory
Fish And Associates
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Defendant
Tempur Pedic International Inc
Terminated: 03/27/2013
Represented By
William J O'Brien
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Allen S. Rugg
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Eric G.J. Kaviar
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Robert C Bertin
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Robert M. Abrahamsen
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Defendant
Tempur Pedic North America LLC
Terminated: 03/27/2013
Represented By
William J O'Brien
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Allen S. Rugg
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Eric G.J. Kaviar
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Robert C Bertin
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Robert M. Abrahamsen
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Defendant
Tempur Pedic Sales Inc
Terminated: 03/27/2013
Represented By
William J O'Brien
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Allen S. Rugg
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Eric G.J. Kaviar
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
John L. Strand
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Robert C Bertin
Bingham Mccutchen LLP
contact info
Robert M. Abrahamsen
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info
Michael A. Albert
Wolf, Greenfield & Sacks, PC
contact info

GPO Sep 28 2011
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: OPINION AND ORDER entered in case 1:09-cv-10293-GAO; denying (130) Motion for Summary Judgment; granting (162) Motion for Summary Judgment; denying (172) Motion to Amend to Join OKO Universal Inc. And for Leave to Amend Counterclaims in case 1:09-cv-11550-GAO Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-10293-GAO, 1:09-cv-11550-GAO(Danieli, Chris)
GPO Mar 13 2014
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment.Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-11550-GAO, 1:09-cv-10293-GAO(Lyness, Paul)
GPO Mar 13 2015
Judge George A. OToole, Jr: ORDER entered denying 343 Motion for Attorney Fees (Danieli, Chris)

1. Don't Sleep on Rule 37 Motions re: Patent Litigation (natlawreview.com)
Submitted Thu 04/02/2015
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, July 09, 2015
398 398 appeal USCA Mandate Thu 07/09 1:18 PM
MANDATE of USCA for the Federal Circuit as to392 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by Ascion, LLC. Appeal392 Terminated. ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal 22 filed by Appellant Ascion, LLC. The appeal is dismissed. Each party shall bear its own costs. ISSUED AS A MANDATE. (Paine, Matthew)
Related: [-]