California Northern District Court
Case #: 3:03-cv-00521
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2003
Terminated:Mar 21, 2006
3rd party defendant
U.S. District Court
Counter-claimant
Secure Data In Motion, Inc.
Counter-defendant
Mayfield
Counter-defendant
Mayfield Associates Fund IV, L.P.
Counter-defendant
Mayfield Associates Fund VI
Counter-defendant
Mayfield IX, L.P.
Counter-defendant
Mayfield Principals Fund II
Counter-defendant
Mayfield XI
Counter-defendant
Mayfield XI Qualified
Counter-defendant
PostX Corporation
Defendant
Secure Data In Motion, Inc.
Defendant
SIGABA
Plaintiff
PostX Corporation

GPO Jun 30 2005
SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 6/30/05. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2005)
GPO Jul 07 2005
SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 7/7/05. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2005) (Sealed documents filed Case No. 02-4483) Modified on 7/8/2005 (ys, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jul 07 2005
***DUPLICATE OF #225***SEALING ORDER (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2005) Modified on 7/8/2005 (ys, COURT STAFF).
GPO Jul 07 2005
SEALING ORDER. Signed by Judge ILLSTON on 7/7/05. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2005) (Sealed documents filed Case No.02-4483) Modified on 7/8/2005 (ys, COURT STAFF).
GPO Sep 14 2005
ORDER granting moton to seal filed by pltf.. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/13/05. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2005)
GPO Sep 14 2005
ORDER granting defts. motion to seal.. Signed by Judge Illston on 9/13/05. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2005)
GPO Oct 07 2005
ORDER continuing pretrial and trial. Signed by Judge Illston on 10/6/05. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2005)
GPO Feb 09 2006
PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/9/06. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2006)
GPO Apr 12 2006
ORDER continuing motions to 6/2/06 @ 9 a.m.. Signed by Judge Illston on 4/12/06. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2006)
GPO May 12 2006
ORDER continuing motions to 6/9/06. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/11/06. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2006)
GPO Jul 19 2006
ORDER DENYING SIGABA?S POST TRIAL MOTIONS (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2006)
GPO Jul 24 2006
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF?S BILL OF COSTS. Signed by Judge Illston on 7/24/06. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
GPO Jul 24 2006
ORDER denying rule 50 motions. Signed by Judge Illston on 7/24/06. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2006)
GPO Feb 07 2007
ORDER granting request to unsealing portions of the record.. Signed by Judge Illston on 2/6/07. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2007)
GPO Mar 19 2008
ORDER exonerating bonding company. Signed by Judge Illston on 3/18/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2008)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.