California Northern District Court
Case #: 5:02-cv-02659
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:44 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2002
Terminated:Jul 07, 2006
Counter-claimant
NeoPets Inc
Counter-defendant
Joseph Enterprises, Inc
Defendant
NeoPets Inc
Defendant
The Dohring Company Inc
Mediator
Nathan Lane
Mediator
Philip L. Gregory
Plaintiff
Joseph Enterprises, Inc

GPO Jul 20 2005
ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL RESETTING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 20, 2005. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2005)
GPO Sep 15 2005
ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Ware on September 15, 2005. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2005)
GPO Nov 08 2005
STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing Trial Resetting Conference to 01/23/06 at 10:00 am.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 11/08/05. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2005)
GPO Jan 20 2006
STIPULATION AND ORDER Trial Resetting Conference set for 4/3/2006 11:00 AM.. Signed by Judge James Ware on 01/20/06. (mp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2006)
GPO Apr 04 2006
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSESigned by Judge James Ware on 04/04/2006. (jwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2006)
GPO Jun 16 2006
ORDER RESCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge James Ware on June 16, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2006)
GPO Jul 07 2006
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James Ware on July 7, 2006. (jwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2006)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.