Colorado District Court
Judge:Marcia S Krieger
Referred: Michael J Watanabe
Case #: 1:02-cv-01053
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2002
Terminated:Apr 07, 2005

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, September 15, 2006
22 22 3 pgs NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Luz Margarita Chilo Luz Margarita Chilon Narro, Flor Narro Asencio, Casanova Miranda Aide, Marcelino Zarate Polanco, Juan Miguel Martinez Mendoza, Lizardo Zarate Carrasco, Domitila Saldana Marin, Noe David Zarate Carrasco, Homber Callirgos Torres, Delsy Jacquelin Zarat Delsy Jacquelin Zarate Carrasco, Municipalidad Provincial de Cajamarca, Ricardina Terrones Rodriquez, Lucia Narro Terrones, Margarita Martinez Alvarado, Daniel Diaz Herrera, Rosa Maribel Narro Terrones, German Olortegui Munos, Felipa Paico Azanero, Cristobal Ruiz Miranda, Clotilde Carmona Saucedo, Luciano Guarniz Herrera, Elmer Zarate Carrasco, Marciano Ruiz Mendoza, Oscar Herrera Azanero, Isabel Tuesta Mendoza, Victor Herrera Narro, Jaime Zarate Carrasco, Rosa Alcira Miranda Saldana, Cayetano Saldana Vasquez, Marcial Alvitres Tuesta, Jose Pastor Gutierre Jose Pastor Gutierrez Sanchez (Nelson, Danial)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2005
21 21 NOTICE of Change of Address by Danial Alan Nelson (erv, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 07, 2005
20 20 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE, Pursuant to the parties Joint Report, and it appearing to the Court that there is no need for further proceedings in federal court at this time and no likelihood of such need in the forseeable future, the Court directs that these cases be Administratively Closed. Should subsequent events warrant, either side may file a properly-supported motion to reopen either or both cases. Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/7/05 . Signed by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/7/05. (erv, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2003
19 19 COURTROOM MINUTES of Rule 16 Conf by Judge Marcia S. Krieger ; rule 16 conf held on 2/3/03 , , CASE STAYED until a final detemination is made on the appeal of the order of dismissal [19-3] by either the Colorado Court of Appeals if certiorari is neither requested or granted by the Colorado Supreme Court or if certiorari is requested and granted a final determination by the Colorado Supreme Court. Within 30 days following that determination, the parties are invited to file a joint document without supplemental attachments, advising the court as to their preference in proceeding with the state court cases or in these cases, or they may have made such progress in alternative dispute resolution that it is not necessary to do either ; entry date : 2/7/03 Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman (erv)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2002
18 18 ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Judge Marcia S. Krieger ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:30 2/3/03 (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2002
17 17 RESPONSE by Plas' to brief [13-1], reply [16-1] Re: Subject matter Jurisdiction and Abstenntion (erv)
Related: [-]
16 16 REPLY by Dfts' to brief [14-1]Re: Subject matter Jurisdiction and Abstention (erv)
Related: [-]
15 15 REPLY Brief on Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Abstention by plaintiff [14-1] (placed in brown accordian folder as oversized) (erv)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2002
14 14 Memorandum BRIEF FILED by Plas' pursuant to the Ct's minute [11-1] Order dtated 8/26/02 on Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Abstention (erv)
Related: [-]
13 13 BRIEF FILED by Dfts' pursunat to the Orders of the Ct minutes [11-1] dated 8/26/02 Re: Subject matter Jurisdiction and Abstention (erv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2002
12 12 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; status conf VACATED 9/10/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/11/02 (erv)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2002
11 11 COURTROOM MINUTES Hrg on Order to Show Cause/Rule 16 Conf by Judge Marcia S. Krieger pursuant to [4-1] order to show cause; It is ORDERED that simultaneous briefs as to subject matter jurisdiction and abstention issues are due 9/30/02; simultaneous responses are due 10/18/02; Rule 16 Conf is continued until after 10/18/02, to a date set by the court by a written notice of hrg ; entry date : 8/26/02 Court Reporter: Paul Zuckerman (erv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2002
10 10 STATUS REPORT by Dfts' pursuant to Order dated 7/23/02 (erv)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger granting Dfts motion to extend time to Answer Complaint extended to: 9/9/02 [7-1] No Further Extensions will be Granted (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/21/02 (erv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2002
8 8 Response to Sua Sponte ORDER to show cause by Plas' why case should not be dismissed for lack of diversity jurisdiction [4-1] (erv)
Related: [-]
7 7 UNopposed MOTION by dfts' to extend time to Answer Complaint extended to: 9/9/02 (erv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2002
6 6 STIPULATION re: Service of Process by Plas' and Dfts (erv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2002
5 5 MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; status conf set for 8:30 9/9/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/25/02 (dlb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2002
4 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: by Judge Marcia S. Krieger returnable 1:30 8/26/02 by Parties shall appear and Show Cause why this case should not be Dismssed for lack of Diversity Jurisdiction and setting Rule 16 Pre-Trial Conf (cc: all counsel) (erv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2002
3 3 ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger of Opportunity for Accelerated Service (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/19/02 (erv)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER stat,stlmt,pt,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Marcia S. Krieger (cc: to counsel) (erv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2002
1 1 COMPLAINT for Damages (Summons(es) issued); jury demand (bpm)
Related: [-]
FILING FEE PAID: on 6/3/02 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 235238. (bpm)
Related: [-]