New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:04-cv-05084
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 18, 2004
Terminated:Mar 02, 2007
Counter Claimant
BOAG
Counter Claimant
BOROUGH OF SEASIDE PARK
Counter Claimant
BOROUGH OF SEASIDE PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Counter Claimant
WILLIAM BEINING
Counter Defendant
JOSE ROMAN
Counter Defendant
MELANIE BRUNO
Counter Defendant
MELISSA BRUNO
Cross Claimant
BOAG
Cross Claimant
BOROUGH OF SEASIDE PARK
Cross Claimant
BOROUGH OF SEASIDE PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Cross Claimant
CHRIS WOLFGRUBER
Cross Claimant
JAMES CITTA
Cross Claimant
METROPOLITAN AREA SECURITY, INC.
Cross Claimant
METROPOLITAN AREA SERVICE
Cross Claimant
MILLION BUCKS, INC.
Cross Claimant
PETER J. LANG
Cross Claimant
SAWMILL RESTAURANT and TAVERN
Cross Claimant
STEPHEN DONOFRIO
Cross Claimant
WILLIAM BEINING
Cross Defendant
B. RAIN
Cross Defendant
BOAG
Cross Defendant
BOROUGH OF SEASIDE PARK
Cross Defendant
BOROUGH OF SEASIDE PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Cross Defendant
CHRIS WOLFGRUBER
Cross Defendant
JAMES AZAMBUJA
Cross Defendant
JAMES CITTA
Cross Defendant
JOHN DOE
Cross Defendant
JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS
Cross Defendant
JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS
Cross Defendant
JOSE ROMAN
Cross Defendant
METROPOLITAN AREA SECURITY, INC.
Cross Defendant
METROPOLITAN AREA SERVICE
Cross Defendant
MILLION BUCKS, INC.
Cross Defendant
NICOLE HYRA
Cross Defendant
PETER J. LANG
Cross Defendant
SAWMILL RESTAURANT and TAVERN
Cross Defendant
STEPHEN DONOFRIO
Cross Defendant
WILLIAM BEINING
Defendant
B. RAIN
Defendant
BOAG
Defendant
BOROUGH OF SEASIDE PARK
Defendant
BOROUGH OF SEASIDE PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT
Defendant
CHRIS WOLFGRUBER
Defendant
JAMES AZAMBUJA
Defendant
JAMES CITTA
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Defendant
JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS
Defendant
JOHN DOE INDIVIDUALS
Defendant
METROPOLITAN AREA SECURITY, INC.
Defendant
METROPOLITAN AREA SERVICE
Defendant
MILLION BUCKS, INC.
Defendant
NICOLE HYRA
Defendant
PETER J. LANG
Defendant
SAW MILL CAFE
Defendant
SAWMILL RESTAURANT and TAVERN
Defendant
STEPHEN DONOFRIO
Defendant
WILLIAM BEINING
Movant
SEAN P FOLEY
Plaintiff
JOSE ROMAN
Plaintiff
MELANIE BRUNO
Plaintiff
MELISSA BRUNO

GPO Aug 12 2005
OPINION re: 24 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. (ms)
GPO Aug 14 2006
LETTER OPINION re: document 57 motion. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 8/11/06. (lk)
GPO Sep 07 2006
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Garrett E. Brown, Jr. on 9/7/06. (ck, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.