Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:02-cv-03076
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2002
Terminated:Jun 06, 2005
Defendant
Gleaner Life Insurance Society
Plaintiff
David L Blaydes
Plaintiff
Michael J Brdecka

GPO Aug 20 2002
MINUTE ORDER of 8/20/02 by Hon. John W. Darrah : Status hearing held and continued to 10/4/02 at 9:00 a.m. Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' first amended complaint is granted [2-1] with respect to counts I and II and denied with respect to all other counts. Answer or other responsive pleading to be filed by 9/17/02. Entered Memorandum Opinion and Order. Mailed notice (yp)
GPO Jun 30 2004
MINUTE ORDER of 6/30/04 by Hon. John W. Darrah : For the reasons stated in the attached memorandum opinion and order, defendant's motion for sanctions is granted. [47-1] [39-1] Defendant is granted a total of $1,211.70 in attorneys' fees and costs. (Entered Memorandum Opinion and Order.) Mailed notice (hp)
GPO Jun 06 2005
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by Judge Michael T. Mason on 6/6/2005:Judicial staff notice(eav, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.